KS S0557 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Professional employees of schools; renewal of licenses; professional development. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
Professional employees of schools; renewal of licenses; professional development. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing: 3/10/2010, Wed., 1:30 pm, Rm 152-S | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Education -SJ 1105 | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced -SJ 1099 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |