KS S0546 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Assessments of quality assurance fee on skilled nursing care facilities to improve the quality of care. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
Assessments of quality assurance fee on skilled nursing care facilities to improve the quality of care. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-25 | Hearing: 2/26/2010, Fri., 10:30 am, Rm 548-S (cont) | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1028; Hearing: 2/25/2010, Thur., 10:30 am, Rm 548-S | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced -SJ 1024 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |