KS S0531 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1375
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1375
Summary
Radon certification law. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Title
Radon certification law. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Approved by gov. -SJ 1375 | |
2010-04-05 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 1374 | |
2010-03-30 | Concurred; Yeas 37 Nays 3 -SJ 1304; Reengrossed -SJ 1334 | |
2010-03-29 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 94 Nays 25 -HJ 1306 | |
2010-03-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 1256 | |
2010-03-19 | CR: Be passed as am. by Commerce and Labor -HJ 1172 | |
2010-03-15 | Hearing: Thurs., 3/18/2010, 9:00 AM, Rm 784 Docking | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Commerce and Labor -HJ 1011 | |
2010-02-23 | Received and introduced -HJ 1009 | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed -SJ 1098 | |
2010-02-19 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1084; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 34 Nays 6 -SJ 1096 | |
2010-02-17 | CR: Be passed as am. by Federal and State Affairs -SJ 1048 | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 993 | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced -SJ 987 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |