KS S0514 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference committee
Summary
Establishing the community defense act; sexually oriented businesses. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Establishing the community defense act; sexually oriented businesses. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference committee | |
2010-04-28 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -SJ 1378; Motion to concur failed Yeas 20 Nays 20 -SJ 1378; Remains in conference committee -SJ 1379 | |
2010-03-30 | Motion to Concur -SJ 1353; Sub motion to postpone day certain,4/28/2010 -SJ 1353 | |
2010-03-29 | Acceded; apptd Neufeld, Kiegerl, Loganbill -HJ 1302 | |
2010-03-24 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Brungardt, Reitz, Faust-Goudeau -SJ 1284 | |
2010-03-24 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 106 Nays 16 -HJ 1273 | |
2010-03-23 | COW: CR recommending sub. bill be adptd; be am.; Sub. be passed as am -HJ 1249 | |
2010-03-22 | CR: Substitute be passed by Federal and State Affairs -HJ 1194; Substitute introduced & placed on General Orders -HJ 1194 | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -HJ 1009 | |
2010-02-19 | Received and introduced -HJ 989 | |
2010-02-18 | COW: CR recommending sub. bill be adptd; Sub. be passed -SJ 1069; EFA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1081 | |
2010-02-17 | CR: Substitute be passed by Federal and State Affairs -SJ 1048 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Education -SJ 985; Withdrawn from Education -SJ 985; Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 985 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced -SJ 975 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |