KS S0501 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Summary
Kansas board of healing arts; licensure and education of perfusionists. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Kansas board of healing arts; licensure and education of perfusionists. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in House committee | |
2010-03-05 | Referred to Health and Human Services -HJ 1061 | |
2010-03-04 | Received and introduced -HJ 1037 | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed -SJ 1130 | |
2010-03-03 | COW: CR recommending sub. bill be adptd; be am.; Sub. be passed as am -SJ 1126; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 38 Nays 2 -SJ 1126 | |
2010-02-25 | CR: Substitute be passed by Public Health and Welfare -SJ 1109 | |
2010-02-19 | Withdrawn from Ways and Means -SJ 1084; Rereferred to Public Health and Welfare -SJ 1084 | |
2010-02-18 | Withdrawn from Public Health and Welfare -SJ 1082; Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1082 | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Public Health and Welfare -SJ 977 | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced -SJ 970 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |