KS S0491 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1374
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1374
Summary
Respiratory therapists; special permits. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Title
Respiratory therapists; special permits. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Approved by gov. -SJ 1374 | |
2010-03-29 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 1295 | |
2010-03-24 | Concurred; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1259; Reengrossed -SJ 1285 | |
2010-03-19 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 122 Nays 0 -HJ 1165 | |
2010-03-18 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 1156 | |
2010-03-12 | CR: Be passed as am. by Health and Human Services -HJ 1107 | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing: Mon., 3/8/2010, 1:30 PM, Rm 784 Docking | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Health and Human Services -HJ 963 | |
2010-02-17 | Received and introduced -HJ 951 | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed -SJ 1036; FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1035 | |
2010-02-15 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1027 | |
2010-02-11 | CR: Be passed as am. by Public Health and Welfare -SJ 1020 | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Public Health and Welfare -SJ 970 | |
2010-01-29 | Introduced -SJ 968 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |