KS S0480 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Summary
Regulating traffic; license plates. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Regulating traffic; license plates. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in House committee | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Transportation -HJ 1112 | |
2010-03-12 | Received and introduced -HJ 1103 | |
2010-03-11 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 39 Nays 0 -SJ 1167 | |
2010-03-10 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1165; Engrossed -SJ 1168 | |
2010-03-08 | CR: Be passed as am. by Transportation -SJ 1145 | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Transportation -SJ 968 | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced -SJ 963 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |