KS S0478 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Engrossed -SJ 1108; FA: Not passed; Yeas 18 Nays 21 -SJ 1106; Killed, Final Action
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - Engrossed -SJ 1108; FA: Not passed; Yeas 18 Nays 21 -SJ 1106; Killed, Final Action
Summary
Revision of the Kansas cigarette and tobacco products act. Effective date: Statute BK.
Title
Revision of the Kansas cigarette and tobacco products act. Effective date: Statute BK.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | Engrossed -SJ 1108; FA: Not passed; Yeas 18 Nays 21 -SJ 1106; Killed, Final Action | |
2010-02-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1101 | |
2010-02-16 | CR: Be passed as am. by Federal and State Affairs -SJ 1037 | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 968 | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced -SJ 962 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |