KS S0469 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Civil procedure, commercial property liens; state construction registry, notice of commencement and notice of furnishings. Effective date: 7/01/2011 & St Bk.
Title
Civil procedure, commercial property liens; state construction registry, notice of commencement and notice of furnishings. Effective date: 7/01/2011 & St Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-25 | Hearing: 3/03/2010, Wed., 9:30 am, Rm 548-S | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 965 | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced -SJ 953 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |