KS S0460 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1374
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1374
Summary
Children; permanency and priority of orders. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Title
Children; permanency and priority of orders. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Approved by gov. -SJ 1374 | |
2010-03-29 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 1295 | |
2010-03-24 | Concurred; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1258; Reengrossed -SJ 1285 | |
2010-03-23 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 122 Nays 0 -HJ 1236 | |
2010-03-22 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 1205 | |
2010-03-18 | CR: Be passed as am. by Judiciary -HJ 1159 | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing: Thurs., 3/11/2010, 3:30PM, Rm 346-S | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 1026 | |
2010-02-26 | Received and introduced -HJ 1019 | |
2010-02-25 | Engrossed -SJ 1108; FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 39 Nays 0 -SJ 1106 | |
2010-02-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1101 | |
2010-02-17 | CR: Be passed as am. by Judiciary -SJ 1048 | |
2010-02-16 | Withdrawn from Ways and Means -SJ 1029; Rereferred to Judiciary -SJ 1029 | |
2010-02-15 | Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 1025; Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1025 | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 955 | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced -SJ 951 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |