KS S0399 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Controlled substances; aggravated endangering a child; enhanced penalties for distributing on park property and distributing to a child or pregnant person. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Controlled substances; aggravated endangering a child; enhanced penalties for distributing on park property and distributing to a child or pregnant person. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-03-09 | Withdrawn from calendar, rereferred to Judiciary -SJ 1147 | |
2010-03-02 | COW: Be passed over and retain a place on calendar -SJ 1118 | |
2010-02-25 | CR: Be passed as am. by Judiciary -SJ 1108 | |
2010-02-19 | Withdrawn from Ways and Means -SJ 1084; Rereferred to Judiciary -SJ 1084 | |
2010-02-18 | Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 1082; Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1082 | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 937 | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced -SJ 931 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |