KS S0396 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1282
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-24 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1282
Summary
Laboratory equipment fund. Effective date: 7/01/2010.
Title
Laboratory equipment fund. Effective date: 7/01/2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Approved by gov. -SJ 1282 | |
2010-03-19 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 1234 | |
2010-03-12 | FA: Passed; Yeas 112 Nays 1 -HJ 1104 | |
2010-03-09 | CR: Be passed & placed on consent calendar by Agriculture and Natural Resources -HJ 1070 | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing: Tues., 3/2/2010, 3:30 PM, Rm 783 Docking | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources -HJ 963 | |
2010-02-17 | Received and introduced -HJ 951 | |
2010-02-17 | Engrossed -SJ 1047 | |
2010-02-16 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1038; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1040 | |
2010-02-11 | CR: Be passed as am. by Ways and Means -SJ 1020 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 932 | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced -SJ 929 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |