KS S0389 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1375
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1375
Summary
Dentists; prohibition on limiting payment for services not covered under insurance policy. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Title
Dentists; prohibition on limiting payment for services not covered under insurance policy. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Approved by gov. -SJ 1375 | |
2010-04-05 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 1374 | |
2010-03-30 | Reengrossed -SJ 1302 | |
2010-03-29 | Concurred; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1293 | |
2010-03-29 | Acceded; apptd Shultz, Peck, Swenson -HJ 1302 | |
2010-03-24 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Teichman, Brownlee, Steineger -SJ 1286 | |
2010-03-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 1278; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 114 Nays 5 -HJ 1296 | |
2010-03-22 | CR: Be passed as am. by Insurance -HJ 1217 | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing: Thurs., 3/11/2010, 3:30 PM, Rm 152-S | |
2010-02-19 | Referred to Insurance -HJ 989 | |
2010-02-18 | Received and introduced -HJ 980 | |
2010-02-18 | Engrossed -SJ 1062; FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1060 | |
2010-02-17 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1053 | |
2010-02-11 | CR: Be passed as am. by Financial Institutions and Insurance -SJ 1019 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Financial Institutions and Insurance -SJ 932 | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced -SJ 929 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |