KS S0366 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Requiring all local exchange carriers to reduce intrastate access charges to interstate levels by July 1, 2010. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Requiring all local exchange carriers to reduce intrastate access charges to interstate levels by July 1, 2010. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-17 | Withdrawn from Ways and Means -SJ 1044; Rereferred to Utilities -SJ 1044 | |
2010-02-16 | Withdrawn from Utilities -SJ 1029; Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1029 | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Utilities -SJ 926 | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced -SJ 921 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |