KS S0358 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
State aid for special education; catastrophic state aid. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
State aid for special education; catastrophic state aid. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-04 | Hearing: 2/08/2010, Mon, 1:30 pm, Rm 152-S (cont) | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing: 2/03/2010, Wed, 1:30 pm, Rm 152-S | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to Education -SJ 920 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced -SJ 916 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |