KS S0350 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Supplemental appropriations for FY 2010 for various state agencies. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
Supplemental appropriations for FY 2010 for various state agencies. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-01-13 | Hearing: 1/19/2010, Tues., 10:30 am, Rm 548-S | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 916 | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced -SJ 909 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |