KS S0309 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Appropriations for FY2010 and FY2011 for capital improvements for various state agencies. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Appropriations for FY2010 and FY2011 for capital improvements for various state agencies. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-03-16 | Hearing: 3/19/2009, Thur., 10:30 am, Rm 545-N | |
2009-02-16 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 287 | |
2009-03-09 | Introduced -SJ 283 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |