KS S0265 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Energy conservation and electric generation, transmission and efficiency and air emissions. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
Energy conservation and electric generation, transmission and efficiency and air emissions. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-02-19 | Hearing: 2/25/2009, Wed., 1:30 pm, Rm 545-N (Cont) | |
2009-02-16 | Hearing: 2/18/2009, Wed., 1:00 pm, Rm 545-N; Hearing: 2/19/2009, Thur., 7:30 am, Rm 545-N (Cont) | |
2009-02-13 | Referred to Utilities -SJ 177 | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced -SJ 148 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |