KS S0258 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Workers compensation act, to increase the caps on benefits. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
Workers compensation act, to increase the caps on benefits. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-01-15 | Withdrawn from Commerce -SJ 926; Referred to Business and Labor -SJ 926 | |
2009-02-26 | Hearing: 3/03/2009, Tues., 8:30 am, Rm 545-N; Hearing: 3/04/2009, Wed., 8:30 am, Rm 545-N (Cont) | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Commerce -SJ 144 | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced -SJ 139 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |