KS S0234 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1375
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Approved by gov. -SJ 1375
Summary
Concerning civil procedure and garnishment. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Title
Concerning civil procedure and garnishment. Effective date: 07/01/2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Approved by gov. -SJ 1375 | |
2010-04-05 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 1374 | |
2010-03-30 | Engrossed -SJ 1302 | |
2010-03-29 | Concurred; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1292 | |
2010-03-24 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 120 Nays 2 -HJ 1268 | |
2010-03-23 | COW: CR recommending sub. bill be adptd; be am.; Sub. be passed as am -HJ 1237 | |
2010-03-22 | CR: Substitute be passed by Judiciary -HJ 1195; Substitute introduced & placed on General Orders -HJ 1195 | |
2010-03-10 | Hearing: Mon., 3/15/2010, 3:30 PM, Rm 346-S | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 963 | |
2010-02-17 | Received and introduced -HJ 951 | |
2010-02-16 | FA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1033 | |
2010-02-15 | COW: Be passed -SJ 1027 | |
2010-02-10 | CR: Be passed by Judiciary -SJ 1011 | |
2009-02-18 | Withdrawn from Ways and Means -SJ 199; Rereferred to Judiciary -SJ 199 | |
2009-02-17 | Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 190; Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 190 | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 127 | |
2009-02-06 | Introduced -SJ 124 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |