KS S0179 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Racial profiling; definition thereof, required policies by law enforcement agencies; investigation of complaints. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Racial profiling; definition thereof, required policies by law enforcement agencies; investigation of complaints. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-01-15 | Withdrawn from calendar, rereferred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 926 | |
2009-03-13 | CR: Be passed as am. by Federal and State Affairs -SJ 317 | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 119 | |
2009-02-03 | Introduced -SJ 105 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |