KS S0160 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by gov. -SJ 756
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by gov. -SJ 756
Summary
Kansas minimum wage law; minimum wage increase. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Title
Kansas minimum wage law; minimum wage increase. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Approved by gov. -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-13 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-06 | Reengrossed -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-03 | Adptd CCR on senate bill; Yeas 33 Nays 5 -SJ 751 | |
2009-04-03 | Adptd CCR; Yeas 110 Nays 15 -HJ 573 | |
2009-03-30 | Acceded; apptd Brunk, Grange, Ruiz -HJ 448 | |
2009-03-30 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Wysong, Lynn, Holland -SJ 533 | |
2009-03-25 | COW: CR be adptd; be further am.; be passed as am. -HJ 432; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 104 Nays 21 -HJ 435 | |
2009-03-19 | CR: Be passed as am. by Commerce and Labor -HJ 341 | |
2009-02-25 | Hearing: Thurs., 3/5/09, 9:00AM, Rm 784 Docking | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Commerce and Labor -HJ 224 | |
2009-02-20 | Received and introduced -HJ 206 | |
2009-02-20 | Engrossed -SJ 238 | |
2009-02-19 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 223; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 33 Nays 7 -SJ 231 | |
2009-02-18 | CR: Be passed as am. by Commerce -SJ 203 | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Commerce -SJ 108 | |
2009-02-02 | Introduced -SJ 99 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |