KS S0155 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Center for health and environmental statistics employees; fingerprinting, criminal history record checks. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
Center for health and environmental statistics employees; fingerprinting, criminal history record checks. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-02-04 | Hearing: 2/12/2009, Thur., 9:30 am, Rm 545-N | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 108 | |
2009-02-02 | Introduced -SJ 99 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |