KS S0123 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-27 - Approved by gov. -SJ 532
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-27 - Approved by gov. -SJ 532
Summary
Antique vehicles; city issued license plates. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Title
Antique vehicles; city issued license plates. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-27 | Approved by gov. -SJ 532 | |
2009-03-20 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 403 | |
2009-03-18 | FA: Passed; Yeas 122 Nays 0 -HJ 317 | |
2009-03-17 | COW: Be passed -HJ 307 | |
2009-03-16 | Withdrawn from consent calendar; placed on general orders -HJ 299 | |
2009-03-11 | CR: Be passed & placed on consent calendar by Transportation -HJ 276 | |
2009-02-25 | Hearing: Thurs., 3/5/09, 1:30PM, Rm 783 Docking | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Transportation -HJ 194 | |
2009-02-18 | Received and introduced -HJ 189 | |
2009-02-17 | FA: Passed; Yeas 39 Nays 0 -SJ 190 | |
2009-02-12 | CR: Be passed & placed on consent calendar by Transportation -SJ 167 | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to Transportation -SJ 75 | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced -SJ 66 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |