KS S0118 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Summary
Cities; certain unilateral annexations; county commission approval. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Cities; certain unilateral annexations; county commission approval. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Rejected by House | |
2010-03-29 | Stricken, House Rule 1507 -HJ 1309 | |
2010-03-19 | CR: Substitute be passed by Local Government -HJ 1184; Substitute introduced & placed on General Orders -HJ 1184 | |
2009-03-17 | Withdrawn from Elections -HJ 304; Referred to Local Government -HJ 304 | |
2009-03-04 | Hearing: Wed., 3/11/09, 3:30 PM, Rm 446-N | |
2009-02-16 | Referred to Elections -HJ 165 | |
2009-02-13 | Received and introduced -HJ 164 | |
2009-02-12 | COW: Be passed -SJ 167; EFA: Passed; Yeas 34 Nays 4 -SJ 171 | |
2009-02-11 | CR: Be passed by Ethics and Elections -SJ 146 | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to Ethics and Elections -SJ 75 | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced -SJ 66 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |