KS S0086 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-27 - Approved by gov. -SJ 532
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-27 - Approved by gov. -SJ 532
Summary
Secretary of state; letters of good standing. Effective date: 7/01/2010 & St Bk.
Title
Secretary of state; letters of good standing. Effective date: 7/01/2010 & St Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-27 | Approved by gov. -SJ 532 | |
2009-03-20 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 403 | |
2009-03-13 | FA: Passed; Yeas 115 Nays 3 -HJ 284 | |
2009-03-10 | CR: Be passed & placed on consent calendar by Judiciary -HJ 269 | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 141 | |
2009-02-09 | Received and introduced -HJ 137 | |
2009-02-05 | COW: Be passed -SJ 121; EFA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 122 | |
2009-02-04 | CR: Be passed by Judiciary -SJ 115 | |
2009-01-26 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 61 | |
2009-01-23 | Introduced -SJ 57 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |