KS S0074 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - Rejected by House
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - Rejected by House
Summary
School districts; finance; use of unencumbered funds; KPERS weighting; contingency reserve fund, limitation. Effective date: KS Reg.
Title
School districts; finance; use of unencumbered funds; KPERS weighting; contingency reserve fund, limitation. Effective date: KS Reg.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Rejected by House | |
2010-05-10 | FA: Not passed; Yeas 41 Nays 76 -HJ 1804 | |
2010-05-08 | COW: CR recommending sub. bill be adptd; be am.; Sub. be passed as am -HJ 1784 | |
2010-05-07 | Mtn.to move to 1st ord of bus on G.O.prev. 72-45 -HJ 1772 | |
2010-05-04 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -HJ 1450 | |
2010-05-03 | CR: Substitute be passed by Education Budget -HJ 1449; Substitute introduced & placed on General Orders -HJ 1449 | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Education Budget -HJ 244 | |
2009-02-27 | Received and introduced -HJ 239 | |
2009-02-26 | FA: Passed; Yeas 38 Nays 2 -SJ 243 | |
2009-02-25 | COW: Be passed -SJ 241 | |
2009-02-17 | CR: Be passed by Ways and Means -SJ 197 | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 61 | |
2009-01-22 | Introduced -SJ 54 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |