KS S0066 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by gov. -SJ 756
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Approved by gov. -SJ 756
Summary
Creating the judicial branch surcharge fund; docket fee increase for prosecuting attorneys' training fund; funding recodification commission; judicial performance commission not required to evaluate retired senior judges; court of appeals, 14th judge; district courts, transmittal of documents. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Title
Creating the judicial branch surcharge fund; docket fee increase for prosecuting attorneys' training fund; funding recodification commission; judicial performance commission not required to evaluate retired senior judges; court of appeals, 14th judge; district courts, transmittal of documents. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Approved by gov. -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-13 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-06 | Engrossed -SJ 756 | |
2009-04-03 | Adptd CCR on senate bill; Yeas 36 Nays 2 -SJ 709 | |
2009-04-03 | Adptd CCR; Yeas 104 Nays 20 -HJ 592 | |
2009-03-31 | Acceded; apptd Kinzer, Whitham, Pauls -HJ 462 | |
2009-03-31 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Owens, Schmidt,D., Haley -SJ 541 | |
2009-03-25 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 125 Nays 0 -HJ 424 | |
2009-03-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 407 | |
2009-03-17 | CR: Be passed as am. by Judiciary -HJ 311 | |
2009-02-25 | Hearing: Wed., 3/04/09, 3:30PM, Rm 143-N | |
2009-02-13 | Referred to Judiciary -HJ 163 | |
2009-02-12 | Received and introduced -HJ 153 | |
2009-02-10 | COW: Be passed -SJ 141; EFA: Passed; Yeas 39 Nays 0 -SJ 141 | |
2009-02-09 | CR: Be passed by Judiciary -SJ 135 | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 61 | |
2009-01-22 | Introduced -SJ 53 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |