KS S0041 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Approved by gov. -SJ 902
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Approved by gov. -SJ 902
Summary
School districts; computation of state aid when districts enlarge; personal financial literacy and disability history and awareness programs; repeal of archaic statutes relating to transfers of funds and property. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Title
School districts; computation of state aid when districts enlarge; personal financial literacy and disability history and awareness programs; repeal of archaic statutes relating to transfers of funds and property. Effective date: 7/01/2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Approved by gov. -SJ 902 | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and presented to gov. -SJ 902 | |
2009-05-11 | Engrossed -SJ 902 | |
2009-05-08 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -SJ 878; Suspend joint rule 3(f) re: copies -SJ 879; Adptd CCR on senate bill; Yeas 34 Nays 0 -SJ 879 | |
2009-04-02 | Adptd CCR; Yeas 119 Nays 5 -HJ 542 | |
2009-03-25 | Acceded; apptd Aurand, Horst, Winn -HJ 439 | |
2009-03-25 | Nonconcurred; CC requested; apptd Schodorf, Vratil, Hensley -SJ 508 | |
2009-03-25 | FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 125 Nays 0 -HJ 422 | |
2009-03-24 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -HJ 407 | |
2009-03-17 | CR: Be passed as am. by Education -HJ 308 | |
2009-02-25 | Hearing: Tues., 3/3/09, 9:00AM, Rm 711 Docking | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Education -HJ 126 | |
2009-02-04 | Received and introduced -HJ 116 | |
2009-02-03 | COW: Be passed -SJ 109; EFA: Passed; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 111 | |
2009-01-27 | CR: Be passed by Education -SJ 73 | |
2009-01-16 | Referred to Education -SJ 46 | |
2009-01-15 | Introduced -SJ 43 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |