KS S0017 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Videotaping felony interrogations. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Videotaping felony interrogations. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
Sen. David Haley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-01-15 | Hearing: 1/22/2009, Thur., 9:30 am, Rm 545-N | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 33 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced -SJ 9 | |
2009-01-09 | Prefiled for introduction |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |