KS HR6018 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, April 3, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, April 3, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the federal government address water issues in the Arkansas River basis.
Title
Requesting the federal government address water issues in the Arkansas River basis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | House Enrolled on Wednesday, April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2019-03-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-03-19 | House | House Introduced |