KS HR6015 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - House Enrolled on Thursday, April 8, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the legislative coordinating council to revoke an executive order issued by the governor related to mandating face coverings if such an executive order is issued while the legislature is adjourned.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the legislative coordinating council to revoke an executive order issued by the governor related to mandating face coverings if such an executive order is issued while the legislature is adjourned.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 84 Nay: 39 (Y: 84 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseHouse Enrolled on Thursday, April 8, 2021
2021-03-30HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 84 Nay: 39
2021-03-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2021-03-29HouseHouse Referred to Committee of the Whole
2021-03-29HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback