KS HR6005 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - House Enrolled on Thursday, February 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - House Enrolled on Thursday, February 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution recognizing National Catholic Schools Week.
Title
Resolution recognizing National Catholic Schools Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Sutton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | House | House Enrolled on Thursday, February 07, 2013 |
2013-02-01 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2013-01-30 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hr6005/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hr6005_enrolled.pdf |