KS HCR5004 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; city home rules, charter ordinance restriction.
Title
Constitutional amendment; city home rules, charter ordinance restriction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 144-S | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/hcr5004/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hcr5004_00_0000.pdf |