KS HCR5002 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-23 - House Engrossed on Wednesday, January 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-23 - House Engrossed on Wednesday, January 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint rules for the senate and house of representatives, 2017-2018.
Title
Joint rules for the senate and house of representatives, 2017-2018.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Ryckman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 7 (Y: 116 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 116 Nay: 7 (Y: 116 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, January 18, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | House | House Enrolled on Friday, January 20, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 3 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was rejected |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Kelly was withdrawn |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Kelly |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was rejected |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-01-12 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 7 |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2017-01-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2017-01-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Rules and Journal |
2017-01-09 | House | House Introduced |