KS HB2813 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the crime of reproductive coercion that includes coercion to obtain an abortion or to gain control over the reproductive autonomy of another person by force; providing penalties.
Title
Creating the crime of reproductive coercion that includes coercion to obtain an abortion or to gain control over the reproductive autonomy of another person by force; providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2024-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-02-21 | House | House Introduced |