KS HB2810 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas life and health guaranty association act to include health maintenance organizations as member insurers and broadening the assessment base for long-term care insurance insolvencies.
Title
Amending the Kansas life and health guaranty association act to include health maintenance organizations as member insurers and broadening the assessment base for long-term care insurance insolvencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2024-03-21 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance |
2024-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2024-02-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2024-02-20 | House | House Introduced |