KS HB2789 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the Kansas staff as first emergency responders (SAFER) act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Kansas staff as first emergency responders (SAFER) act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseHouse Died in Committee
2018-03-27HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 27, 2018, 08:00 AM Room 112-N
2018-03-27HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 27, 2018, 08:00 AM Room 281-N - CANCELLED
2018-03-21HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2018-03-21HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback