KS HB2766 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for House Bill No. 2766 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs-Authorizing self-service of beer from automated devices.
Title
Substitute for House Bill No. 2766 by Committee on Federal and State Affairs-Authorizing self-service of beer from automated devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-03-22 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 22, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S |
2018-03-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2018-03-05 | House | House Introduced |