KS HB2764 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Affiliation with the Kansas police and firemen's retirement system by the Kansas department of wildlife, parks and tourism for membership of certain law enforcement officers and employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affiliation with the Kansas police and firemen's retirement system by the Kansas department of wildlife, parks and tourism for membership of certain law enforcement officers and employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2018-03-12HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 281-N
2018-03-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2018-03-01HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback