KS HB2730 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the division of water resources of the department of agriculture to study and report on the impact of the use of groundwater on streamflow impairments.
Title
Requiring the division of water resources of the department of agriculture to study and report on the impact of the use of groundwater on streamflow impairments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 582-N - CANCELLED |
2018-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water and Environment |
2018-02-08 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2730/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2730_00_0000.pdf |