KS HB2713 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - House Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the revised uniform law on notarial acts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the revised uniform law on notarial acts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED
2020-02-19HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2020-02-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-02-14HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback