KS HB2682 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting agency changes to waiver services under the Kansas program of medical assistance without express legislative authorization.
Title
Prohibiting agency changes to waiver services under the Kansas program of medical assistance without express legislative authorization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-15 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2016-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2016-02-11 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2682/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2682_00_0000.pdf |