KS HB2674 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2674 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Establishing the Kansas telemedicine act and providing for licensure and regulation of dental therapists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2674 by Committee on Public Health and Welfare - Establishing the Kansas telemedicine act and providing for licensure and regulation of dental therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Murnan was rejected - Yea: 49 Nay: 66 (Y: 49 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateSenate Died on Senate General Orders
2018-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2018-03-19SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, March 19, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 118-N
2018-03-01SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2018-02-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2018-02-28HouseHouse Engrossed on Friday, February 23, 2018
2018-02-22HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hodge was rejected
2018-02-22HouseHouse Representative Kelly raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hodge
2018-02-22HouseHouse Representative Kelly raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Crum
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Murnan was rejected Yea: 49 Nay: 66
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Murnan
2018-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
2018-02-12HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 546-S
2018-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
2018-02-07HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback