KS HB2666 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the criminal penalties for certain violations of fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer when the person has prior convictions of the offense.
Title
Increasing the criminal penalties for certain violations of fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer when the person has prior convictions of the offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2024-02-14 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2024-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2024-02-01 | House | House Introduced |