KS HB2665 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Kansas water law study commission.
Title
Establishing a Kansas water law study commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 582-N |
2018-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Water and Environment |
2018-02-07 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2665/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2665_00_0000.pdf |