KS HB2644 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 12, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 12, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the Sandhill plum as the official state fruit.
Title
Designating the Sandhill plum as the official state fruit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 108 Nay: 5 (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 115 Nay: 7 (Y: 115 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 115 Nay: 7 (Y: 115 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Engrossed on Monday, April 4, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 108 Nay: 5 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Hilderbrand and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees |
2022-03-31 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Barker , Representative Arnberger and Representative Ruiz, L. as conferees |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to advance to Final Action subject to amendments, debate and roll call. Motion carried. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 29, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-03-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 115 Nay: 7 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-03-10 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 10, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2022-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2022-02-08 | House | House Introduced |