KS HB2621 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including relations between law enforcement and those interacting with law enforcement in the crime of unlawful sexual relations.
Title
Including relations between law enforcement and those interacting with law enforcement in the crime of unlawful sexual relations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 152-S |
2018-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2018-02-05 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2621/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2621_00_0000.pdf |