KS HB2613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the crime of harassment of a sports official.
Title
Creating the crime of harassment of a sports official.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Samsel [R] | Rep. Megan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2613/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2613_00_0000.pdf |