KS HB2612 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Refugee resettlement; refugee absorptive capacity act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Refugee resettlement; refugee absorptive capacity act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-01HouseHouse Died in Committee
2016-03-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion by Representative Jennings to rerefer to Committee on Federal and State Affairs passed
2016-03-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whipple
2016-03-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Whipple was rejected Yea: 54 Nay: 56
2016-03-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Whipple
2016-03-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
2016-03-03HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2016-02-18HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2016-02-12HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
2016-02-03HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2016-02-03HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback